Docket for 15-6443
No. 15-6443 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Daniel Jon Peterka, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | October 8, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-13081-P) |
Decision Date: | March 9, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 6, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 9, 2015) |
Nov 5 2015 |
Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Nov 24 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 11, 2015. |
Dec 14 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|