Docket for 15-5837
No. 15-5837 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Dorian Frank O'Kelley, Petitioner |
v. |
Bruce Chatman, Warden |
|
Docketed: | August 28, 2015 |
Linked with 14A1254 |
Lower Ct: | Superior Court of Georgia, Butts County |
Case Nos.: | (2010-V-967) |
Decision Date: | September 27, 2013 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | March 30, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 9 2015 |
Application (14A1254) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 28, 2015 to August 27, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jun 12 2015 |
Application (14A1254) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 27, 2015. |
Aug 26 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 28, 2015) |
Sep 28 2015 |
Brief of respondent Bruce Chatman, Warden in opposition filed. |
Oct 7 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Dorian Frank O'Kelley filed. |
Oct 15 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015. |
Nov 2 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|