Docket for 15-5682
No. 15-5682 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Terry Darnell Edwards, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | August 20, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-70026) |
Decision Date: | May 19, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 14 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 21, 2015) |
Sep 18 2015 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Oct 8 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015. |
Nov 2 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|