Docket for 15-5185
No. 15-5185 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jeffrey Robert Martin, Petitioner |
v. |
Pennsylvania |
|
Docketed: | July 14, 2015 |
Linked with 14A969 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District |
Case Nos.: | (603 CAP) |
Decision Date: | September 24, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 18, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 12 2015 |
Application (14A969) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 18, 2015 to May 17, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Mar 17 2015 |
Application (14A969) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 17, 2015. |
Apr 17 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 13, 2015) |
Aug 10 2015 |
Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed. |
Aug 27 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|