Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-474
No. 15-474
Title:
Robert F. McDonnell, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 15, 2015
Linked with 15A218
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-4019)
  Decision Date:July 10, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:August 11, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 20 2015 Application (15A218) for a stay of the mandate, or in the alternative for release on bail pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Aug 24 2015 Upon consideration of the application of counsel for the applicant, it is ordered that a response to the application be filed on or before Wednesday, August 26, 2015, by 4 p.m. It is further ordered that the issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit in case No. 15-4019 is hereby stayed pending consideration of the response and further order of The Chief Justice or of the Court.
Aug 26 2015 Response to application from respondent United States filed.
Aug 27 2015 Reply of applicant Robert F. McDonnell filed.
Aug 31 2015 Application (15A218) referred to the Court.
Aug 31 2015 Application (15A218) granted by the Court. The application for stay of the mandate presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit in case No. 15-4019 is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the judgment of this Court.
Oct 13 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2015)
Oct 16 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the responhdent.
Oct 16 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Nov 12 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 8, 2015.
Nov 13 2015 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Republican Governors Public Policy Committee filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Officials filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Advocates and Business Leaders filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of Former Attorneys General filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of 60 Former State Attorneys General (non - Virginian) filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of Virginia Law Professors filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of Members of the Virginia General Assembly filed.
Nov 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of Benjamin Todd Jealous, et al. filed.
Dec 8 2015 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Dec 21 2015 Reply of petitioner Robert F. McDonnell filed.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Jan 15 2016 Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Feb 10 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Feb 12 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party received from counsel for the respondent.
Feb 24 2016 Motion to deem the Court of Appeals joint appendix and supplemental appendix as the joint appendix in this Court filed by petitioner Robert F. McDonnell.
Feb 24 2016 Supplemental joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Feb 29 2016 Brief of petitioner Robert F. McDonnell filed.
Mar 4 2016 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, April 27, 2016
Mar 7 2016 Motion to deem the Court of Appeals joint appendix and supplemental appendix as the joint appendix in this Court GRANTED.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of Former Virginia Attorneys General filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Officials filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of U.S. Justice Foundation, et al. filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Advocates and Business Leaders filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Republican Governors Public Policy Committee filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of 77 Former State Attorneys General (non - Virginian) filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of James Madison Center for Free Speech filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of Benjamin Todd Jealous, Dolores McQuinn, and Algie T. Howell filed.
Mar 7 2016 Joint appendix consisting of 12 volumes of appendices filed in the U.S.Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of Members of the Virginia General Assembly filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of Virginia Law Professors filed.
Mar 14 2016 Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Mar 15 2016 CIRCULATED.
Mar 17 2016 Record received from U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit is electronic and located on PACE. SEALED record is electronic.
Mar 23 2016 Record received from U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Virginia is electronic and located on PACER. SEALED record is electronic.
Mar 30 2016 Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Apr 6 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington filed. (Distributed)
Apr 6 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law filed. (Distributed)
Apr 6 2016 Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Apr 6 2016 Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, Inc., and Democracy 21 filed. (Distributed)
Apr 6 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Campaign Legal Center filed. (Distributed)
Apr 13 2016 Reply of petitioner Robert F. McDonnell filed. (Distributed)
Apr 27 2016 Argued. For petitioner: Noel J. Francisco, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Michael R. Dreeben, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Jun 27 2016 Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Noel J. Francisco Jones Day(202) 879-3939
    Counsel of Record51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
njfrancisco@jonesday.com
Party name: Robert F. McDonnell
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
 
Michael R. Dreeben Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2201
Department of Justice
Washington, DC  20530
michael.r.dreeben@usdoj.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Brian David Boone Alston & Bird LLP(704) 444-1000
101 .S. Tryon Street
Charlotte, NC  28280
brian boone@alston.com
Party name: 77 Former State Attorneys General (non - Virginian)
 
James Bopp Jr. The Bopp Law Firm, PC(812) 232-2434
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN  47807
jboppjr@aol.com
Party name: James Madison Center for Free Speech
 
John D. Cline Jones Day(415) 875-5812
555 California Street
26th Floor
San Francisco, CA  94104
jcline@jonesday.com
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
 
John D. Cline Law Office of John D. Cline(415) 662-2260
235 Montgomery Street
Suite 1070
San Francisco, CA  94104
cline@johndclinelaw.com
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
 
Charles J. Cooper Cooper & Kirk, PLLC(202) 220-9600
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Party name: Republican Governors Public Policy Committee
 
John Staige Davis V. williams Mullen(804)420-6000
200 South 10th Street
Richmond, VA  23218-1320
jsdavis@williamsmullen.com
Party name: Members of the Virginia General Assembly
 
David J. Debold Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP(202) 955-8500
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
ddebold@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Former Federal Officials
 
Wyatt B. Durrette DurretteCrump PLC(804) 775-6900
1111 EAst Main Street, 16th Floor
Richmond, VA  23219
Party name: Benjamin Todd Jealous, et al.
 
Scott Andrew Eisman Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP212-230-4635
601 Lexington Avenue, 31st Floor
New York, NY  10022
scott.eisman@freshfields.com
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law
 
J. Gerald Hebert The Campaign Legal Center(202) 736-2200
1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400
Washington, DC  20005
ghebert@campaignlegalcenter.org
Party name: Campaign Legal Center
 
William H. Hurd Troutman Sanders, LLP(804) 697-1335
1001 Haxall Point
P.O. Box 1122
Richmond, VA  23219
william.hurd@troutmansanders.com
Party name: Former Virginia Attorneys General
 
Scott L. Nelson Public Citizen Litigation Group(202) 588-1000
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20009
snelson@citizen.org
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc
 
Patrick Pearse O'Donnell Harris wiltshire & Grannis LLP(202) 730-1300
1919 M Street NW, Fl.8
Washington, DC  20036
podonnell@hwglaw.com
Party name: Benjamin Todd Jealous, Dolores McQuinn, and Algie T. Howell
 
Mary Kelly Persyn Persyn Law & Policy628 400-1254
912 Cole Street PMB 124
San Francisco, CA  94117
marykelly@persynlaw.com
Party name: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
 
James F. Peterson Judicial Watch, Inc(202) 646-5172
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC  20024
jpeterson@judicialwatch.org
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
 
Timothy Meade Richardson Poole Brook Plumlee PC(757) 499-1841
Virginia Beach, VA  23462
trichardson@pbp-attorneys.com
Party name: Virginia Law Professors
 
Jay Alan Sekulow American Center for Law & Justice(202) 546-8890
201 Maryland Ave., N.E.
Washington, DC  20002
sekulow@aclj.org
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
 
Gregory Neil Stillman Hunton & Williams LLP(202) 955-1500
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC  20037
gstillman@hunton.com
Party name: Public Policy Advocates and Business Leaders
 
William Woodruff Taylor III. Zuckerman Spaeder LLP(202) 778-1800
1800 M Street, NW
Washington, DC  20036
wtaylor@zuckerman.com
Party name: Law Professors
 
William Woodruff Taylor III. Zuckerman Spaeder LLP(202) 778-1800
1800 M Street, NW, Ste. 1000
Washington, DC  20036-5802
wtaylor@zuckerman.com
Party name: Law Professors
 
Herbert W. Titus William J. Olson, PC(703) 356-5070
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA  22180 - 5615
wjo@mindspring.com
Party name: U.S. Justice Foundation, et al.
June 28, 2016 | Version 2014.1