Docket for 15-374
No. 15-374 | |
Title: |
Kansas, Petitioner |
v. |
Luis A. Aguirre |
|
Docketed: | September 28, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Kansas |
Case Nos.: | (108,570) |
Decision Date: | May 15, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 2, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 23 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2015) |
Oct 6 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 25, 2015. |
Nov 17 2015 |
Brief of respondent Luis A. Aguirre in opposition filed. |
Nov 17 2015 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Luis A. Aguirre. |
Nov 25 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Kansas filed. |
Dec 2 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Jan 11 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016. |
Jan 19 2016 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Jan 19 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|