Docket for 15-293
No. 15-293 | |
Vide 15-302 | |
Title: |
Christopher Burgos, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
New Jersey, et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 10, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of New Jersey |
Case Nos.: | (A-55 September Term 2014, 075736) |
Decision Date: | June 9, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 3 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2015) |
Oct 8 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondents New Jersey, et al. to respond filed. |
Oct 28 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015. |
Nov 5 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due December 7, 2015) |
Nov 19 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 6, 2016. |
Jan 6 2016 |
Brief of respondents New Jersey, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED. |
Jan 15 2016 |
Reply of petitioners Christopher Burgos, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|