Docket for 15-198
No. 15-198 | |
Title: |
John W. Oller, Petitioner |
v. |
Nancye C. Roussel, Individually and in Her Official Capacity as Head of the Department of Communicative Disorders, University of Louisiana at Lafayette, et al. |
|
Docketed: | August 13, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-31101) |
Decision Date: | April 7, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 13, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 10 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2015) |
Sep 14 2015 |
Brief of respondents Nancye C. Roussel, Individually and in Her Official Capacity as Head of the Department of Communicative Disorders, University of Louisiana at Lafayette, et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 30 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 16, 2015. |
Oct 9 2015 |
Reply of petitioner John W. Oller filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 19 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|