~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 15 2015 |
Application (15A77) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 2, 2015 to September 2, 2015, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Jul 21 2015 |
Application (15A77) denied by Justice Scalia. |
Aug 3 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2015) |
Sep 8 2015 |
Brief amici curiae of Texas Civil Rights Project, et al. filed. |
Sep 8 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondents Justin K. Lands, Border Patrol Agent, et al. to respond filed. |
Sep 16 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 9, 2015. |
Sep 23 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due October 23, 2015) |
Oct 14 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 23, 2015. |
Nov 20 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 7, 2016. |
Dec 21 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 11, 2016. |
Feb 11 2016 |
Brief of respondents Justin K. Lands, Border Patrol Agent, et al. in opposition filed. |
Mar 2 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016. |
Mar 2 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Richard Rynearson filed. (Distributed) |
Mar 21 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |