Docket for 15-1286
No. 15-1286 | |
Title: |
Unite Here Local 54, Petitioner |
v. |
Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | April 18, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-4807) |
Decision Date: | January 15, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 14 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2016) |
Apr 26 2016 |
Brief of respondents Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
May 6 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Unite Here Local 54 filed. |
May 10 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2016. |
May 31 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|