Docket for 15-10
No. 15-10 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Thomas Edwin Loden, Jr., Petitioner |
v. |
Marshall L. Fisher, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | July 1, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70033) |
Decision Date: | March 4, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 31, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 29 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2015) |
Jul 31 2015 |
Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. |
Aug 7 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 31, 2015. |
Sep 3 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 18, 2015. |
Sep 18 2015 |
Brief of respondent Marshall L. Fisher, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Thomas Edwin Loden, Jr. filed. |
Oct 7 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015. |
Nov 2 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|