Docket for 14A625
No. 14A625 | |
Title: |
Janice K. Brewer, Governor of Arizona, et al., Applicants |
v. |
Arizona Dream Act Coalition, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 11, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 11 2014 |
Application (14A625) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Dec 11 2014 |
Response to application (14A625) requested by Justice Kennedy, due Tuesday, December 16, 2014, by noon EST. |
Dec 16 2014 |
Response to application from respondent Arizona Dream Act Coalition, et al. filed. |
Dec 17 2014 |
Application (14A625) referred to the Court. |
Dec 17 2014 |
Application (14A625) denied by the Court. |
|