Docket for 14A1288
No. 14A1288 | |
Title: |
Whole Woman's Health, et al., Applicants |
v. |
Kirk Cole, Commissioner, Texas Department of State Health Services, et al. |
|
Docketed: | June 23, 2015 |
Linked with 15-274 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 19 2015 |
Application (14A1288) for a stay of mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Jun 24 2015 |
Response to application (14A1288) requested by Justice Scalia, due Friday, June 26, 2015, by 4:00 ET. |
Jun 25 2015 |
Response to application from respondent Kirk Cole, Commissioner, Texas Department of State Health Services, et al. filed. |
Jun 26 2015 |
Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Texas Eagle Forum, et al. |
Jun 26 2015 |
Reply of applicant Whole Woman's Health, et al. filed. |
Jun 29 2015 |
Application (14A1288) referred to the Court. |
Jun 29 2015 |
The application for stay presented to Justice Scalia and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit in case No. 14-50928 is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the judgment of this Court.
The Chief Justice, Justice Scalia, Justice Thomas, and Justice Alito would deny the application.
|
|