Docket for 14A1264
No. 14A1264 | |
Title: |
United States, Applicant |
v. |
Todd Newman and Anthony Chiasson |
|
Docketed: | June 15, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-1837, 13-1917) |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 15 2015 |
Application (14A1264) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2015 to August 1, 2015, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Jun 16 2015 |
Application (14A1264) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 1, 2015. |
Jun 26 2015 |
Letter dated June 19, 2015, from counsel for respondent Todd Newman received. |
|