Docket for 14-976
No. 14-976 | |
Title: |
CSR plc, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Azure Networks, LLC, et al. |
|
Docketed: | February 12, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2013-1459) |
Decision Date: | November 6, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 4 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2015) |
Mar 11 2015 |
Brief of respondents Azure Networks, LLC, et al. in opposition filed. |
Mar 25 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2015. |
Mar 25 2015 |
Reply of petitioners CSR, PLC, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 20 2015 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. v. Sandoz, Inc., 574 U. S. ___ (2015). |
May 22 2015 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | | |
Dominic E. Massa |
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP | (617) 526-6000 |
Counsel of Record | 60 State Street | |
| Boston, MA 02109 | |
| dominic.massa@wilmerhale.com |
Party name: CSR plc, et al. |
| | |
John A. Dragseth |
Fish & Richardson, P.C., P.A. | (612) 335-5070 |
| 3200 RBC Plaza | |
| 60 South 6th Street | |
| Minneapolis, MN 55402 | |
| dragseth@fr.com |
Party name: Cambridge Silicone Radio International, LLC, et al. |
Attorneys for Respondents: | | |
Michael E. Joffre |
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel | (202)-326-7952 |
Counsel of Record | 1615 M Street NW, Suite 400 | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
| mjoffre@khhte.com |
Party name: Azure Networks, LLC, et al. |