Docket for 14-9740
No. 14-9740 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kenneth Earl Fults, Petitioner |
v. |
Bruce Chatman, Warden |
|
Docketed: | May 13, 2015 |
Linked with 14A822 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-13563) |
Decision Date: | August 26, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 13, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 27 2015 |
Application (14A822) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2015 to April 12, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jan 29 2015 |
Application (14A822) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 12, 2015. |
Apr 13 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 12, 2015) |
Jun 12 2015 |
Brief of respondent Bruce Chatman, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jul 1 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Kenneth Earl Fults filed. |
Jul 2 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|