Docket for 14-9724
No. 14-9724 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Ralph Leroy Menzies, Petitioner |
v. |
Utah |
|
Docketed: | May 12, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Utah |
Case Nos.: | (20120290) |
Decision Date: | September 23, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 12, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 8 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 11, 2015) |
Jun 8 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 13, 2015. |
Jul 13 2015 |
Brief of respondent Utah in opposition filed. |
Jul 22 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Ralph Leroy Menzies filed. |
Jul 30 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|