Docket for 14-9336
No. 14-9336 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Pablo Lucio Vasquez, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | April 15, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-70019) |
Decision Date: | January 23, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 13 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 15, 2015) |
May 14 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 15, 2015. |
Jun 10 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 29, 2015. |
Jun 29 2015 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Jul 16 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|