Docket for 14-9320
No. 14-9320 | |
Title: |
Patrick Alexandre Missud, Petitioner |
v. |
California, et al. |
|
Docketed: | April 14, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-16494) |
Decision Date: | January 12, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 26, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 10 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 14, 2015) |
May 27 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 11, 2015. |
Jun 15 2015 |
The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until July 6, 2015, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. |
Jun 30 2015 |
Petitioner complied with order of June 15, 2015. |
Jul 16 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|