Docket for 14-9289
No. 14-9289 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Earl Forrest, Petitioner |
v. |
Troy Steele, Warden |
|
Docketed: | April 13, 2015 |
Linked with 14A729 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-2888) |
Decision Date: | August 22, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 6, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 29 2014 |
Application (14A729) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 4, 2015 to April 5, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Jan 6 2015 |
Application (14A729) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 6, 2015. |
Feb 5 2015 |
Application (14A729) to extend further the time from March 6, 2015 to April 5, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Feb 11 2015 |
Application (14A729) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 6, 2015. |
Apr 6 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 13, 2015) |
May 13 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 27, 2015. |
May 27 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 17, 2015. |
Jun 17 2015 |
Brief of respondent Troy Steele, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jul 2 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Sep 11 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Earl Forrest filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|