Docket for 14-9006
No. 14-9006 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
James Eugene Bigby, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | March 24, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70020) |
Decision Date: | December 18, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 18 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 23, 2015) |
Apr 22 2015 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
May 6 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 21, 2015. |
May 26 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|