Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-86
No. 14-86
Title:
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Petitioner
v.
Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Docketed:July 28, 2014
Linked with 13A1139
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(11-5110)
  Decision Date:October 1, 2013
  Rehearing Denied:February 26, 2014
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 16 2014 Application (13A1139) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 27, 2014 to June 26, 2014, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
May 19 2014 Application (13A1139) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 26, 2014.
Jun 16 2014 Application (13A1139) to extend further the time from June 26, 2014 to July 25, 2014, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jun 17 2014 Application (13A1139) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 25, 2014.
Jul 25 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2014)
Aug 27 2014 Brief amici curiae of Religious Organizations filed.
Aug 27 2014 Brief of respondent Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc. in opposition filed.
Sep 10 2014 Reply of petitioner Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed.
Sep 10 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014.
Oct 2 2014 Petition GRANTED.
Oct 9 2014 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 26, 2014.
Oct 9 2014 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 15, 2015.
Nov 17 2014 Order further extending time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including December 3, 2014.
Nov 17 2014 Order further extending time to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including January 21, 2015.
Dec 3 2014 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Dec 3 2014 Brief of petitioner Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed.
Dec 9 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Umme-Hani Khan filed.
Dec 10 2014 Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Dec 10 2014 Brief amici curiae of American Jewish Committee, et al. filed.
Dec 10 2014 Brief amicus curiae of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, et al. filed.
Dec 10 2014 Brief amici curiae of National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs, et al. filed.
Dec 10 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. filed.
Dec 10 2014 Brief amici curiae of Fifteen Religious and Civil Rights Organizations filed.
Dec 10 2014 Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
Dec 10 2014 Brief amicus curiae of The Council on American-Islamic Relations filed.
Dec 22 2014 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, February 25, 2015
Dec 22 2014 Record requested from U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit.
Dec 30 2014 Record received from U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit. The record is electronic and located on PACER, also received 1-Box of pleadings in the case.
Jan 7 2015 CIRCULATED.
Jan 21 2015 Brief of respondent Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 28 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed. (Distributed)
Jan 28 2015 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 28 2015 Brief amici curiae of The National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 28 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Feb 18 2015 Reply of petitioner Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed. (Distributed)
Feb 25 2015 Argued. For petitioner: Ian H. Gershengorn, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Shay Dvoretzky, Washington, D. C.
Jun 1 2015 Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Scalia, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part.
Jul 6 2015 JUDGMENT ISSUED.
Jul 21 2015 Record from U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit has been returned.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
 
Ian Heath Gershengorn Principal Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@usdoj.gov
Party name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Attorneys for Respondent:
Shay Dvoretzky Jones Day(202) 879-3939
    Counsel of Record51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
Party name: Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
 
Mark Arnold Knueve Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP614-464-6387
52 East Gay Street
P.O. Box1008
Columubs, OH  43216-1008
maknueve@vorys.com
Party name: Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Other:
Abed Alhamid Ayoub American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee(202) 244-2990
1990 M Street NW
Suite 610
Washington, DC  20036
aayoub@adc.org
Party name: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, et al.
 
Eric S. Baxter The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty(202) 955-0095
1200 New Hampshire Ave. NW, Ste. 700
Washington, DC  20036
ebaxter@becketfund.org
Party name: Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
 
Rose Daly-Rooney Assistant Attorney General(520) 628-6756
400 W. Congress, Bldg. S-315
Tucson, AZ  85701
rose.daly-rooney@azag.gov
Party name: Arizona, et al.
 
David T. Goldberg Donahue & Goldberg, LLP(212) 334-8813
99 Hudson Street, 8th Floor
New York, NY  10013
david@donahuegoldberg.com
Party name: American Jewish Committee, et al.
 
Christopher Ho Legal Aid Society Employment Law Center(415) 864-8848
180 Montgomery Street, Suite 600
San Francisco, CA  94104-4244
cho@las-elc.org
Party name: Umme-Hani Khan
 
Nathan Lewin Lewin & Lewin, LLP(202) 828-1000
888 17th Street, NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC  20006
nat@lewinlewin.com
Party name: National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs, et al.
 
Brendan J. Morrissey Wiley Rein LLP(202)-719-7163
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
bmorrissey@wileyrein.com
Party name: Cato Institute
 
Gregory R. Nevins 730 Peachtree Street NE, Suite 1070(404) 897-1880
Atlanta, GA  30308
gnevins@lambdalegal.org
Party name: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
 
Gene C. Schaerr Law Offices of Gene C. Schaerr(202) 361-1061
332 Constitution Avenue NE
Washington, DC  20002
gschaerr@gmail.com
Party name: Fifteen Religious and Civil Rights Organizations
 
Melissa Arbus Sherry Latham & Watkins LLP(202)-637-2355
555 Eleventh Street, NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC  20004
melissa.sherry@lw.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
 
Charles W. Thompson Jr. International Municipal Lawyers Association(202) 466-5424
7910 Woodmont Avenue, Suite 1440
Bethesda, MD  20814
cthompson@imla.org
Party name: The National Conference of State Legislatures, et al.
 
Rae T. Vann Norris Tysse Lampley & Lakis LLP(202) 629-5600
1501 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC  20005
rvann@ntll.com
Party name: Equal Employment Advisory Council
 
Jenifer Wicks Litigation Director(202) 488-8787
Council on American-Islamic Relations
453 New Jersey Avenue SE
Washington, DC  20003
CivilRights@CAIR.com
Party name: The Council on American-Islamic Relations
June 24, 2016 | Version 2014.1