Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-8349
No. 14-8349     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Timothy Tyrone Foster, Petitioner
v.
Bruce Chatman, Warden
Docketed:February 6, 2015
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Georgia
  Case Nos.:(S14E0771)
  Decision Date:November 3, 2014
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 30 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 9, 2015)
Mar 9 2015 Brief of respondent Bruce Chatman, Warden in opposition filed.
Mar 24 2015 Reply of petitioner Timothy Tyrone Foster filed. (Distributed)
Mar 26 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2015.
Apr 17 2015 Record Requested .
Apr 20 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 24, 2015.
Apr 22 2015 Record received from Superior Court of Georgia, Butts County (6 boxes).
Apr 27 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 1, 2015.
May 4 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 14, 2015.
May 6 2015 Record received from the Supreme Court of Georgia. The record is electronic.
May 18 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 21, 2015.
May 26 2015 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Jun 9 2015 Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Timothy Tyrone Foster.
Jun 15 2015 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 24, 2015.
Jun 15 2015 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 8, 2015.
Jun 17 2015 Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Jul 24 2015 Joint appendix filed (2 Volumes). (Statement of costs filed)
Jul 24 2015 Brief of petitioner Timothy Tyrone Foster filed.
Jul 31 2015 Brief amici curiae of Joseph diGenova, et al. filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief of respondent Bruce Chatman, Warden filed.
Sep 9 2015 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 2, 2015
Sep 21 2015 CIRCULATED
Oct 5 2015 Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner GRANTED. and Stephen B. Bright, Esquire, of Atlanta, Georgia, is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioner in this case.
Oct 6 2015 Reply of petitioner Timothy Tyrone Foster filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2015 Letter from Clerk of Court advising that counsel should be prepared to discuss at oral argument whether certiorari in this case should be directed to the Supreme Court of Georgia or the Superior Court of Butts County, Georgia, and what significance, if any, that determination may have on the Court�s resolution of the case.
Nov 2 2015 Argued. For petitioner: Stephen B. Bright, Atlanta, Ga. (Appointed by this Court.) For respondent: Beth A. Burton, Deputy Attorney General, Atlanta, Ga.
May 23 2016 Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Kennedy, Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
Jun 24 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED
Jun 24 2016 MANDATE ISSUED



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Stephen B. Bright Southern Center for Human Rights(404) 688-1202
    Counsel of Record83 Poplar Street, N.W.
Atlanta, GA  30303-2122
sbright@schr.org
Party name: Timothy Tyrone Foster
Attorneys for Respondent:
Beth A. Burton Deputy Attorney General(404) 545-3499
    Counsel of Record 40 Capitol Square, SW
Atlanta, GA  30334
bburton@law.ga.gov
Party name: Bruce Chatman, Warden
 
 
Richard W. Tangum Assistant Attorney General404-656-3397
Office of the Attorney General
40 Capitol Square, SW
Atlanta, GA  30334-1300
rtangum@law.ga.gov
Party name: Bruce Chatman, Warden
Other:
Paul M. Smith Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6060
1099 New York Avenue, N.W.
Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
psmith@jenner.com
Party name: Joseph diGenova, et al.
June 30, 2016 | Version 2014.1