Docket for 14-8215
No. 14-8215 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jesse Earl Scheuing, Petitioner |
v. |
Alabama |
|
Docketed: | January 30, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama |
Case Nos.: | (CR-10-1454) |
Decision Date: | November 8, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 25, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | September 19, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 27 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 2, 2015) |
Feb 24 2015 |
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. |
Mar 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
Apr 24 2015 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
May 5 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 21, 2015. |
May 26 2015 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
|