Docket for 14-7873
No. 14-7873 | |
Title: |
Lucia Mata, Petitioner |
v. |
Workers' Compensation Appeals Board, et al. |
|
Docketed: | January 7, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Fifth Appellate District |
Case Nos.: | (F069346) |
Decision Date: | August 7, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | October 15, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 3 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 6, 2015) |
Feb 26 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015. |
Mar 23 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
Apr 8 2015 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Apr 15 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 1, 2015. |
May 4 2015 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
|