Docket for 14-6679
No. 14-6679 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Randall Wayne Mays, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | October 10, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70037) |
Decision Date: | June 27, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 5, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 6 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 10, 2014) |
Nov 7 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 10, 2014. |
Dec 10 2014 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Dec 24 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Jan 12 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|