Docket for 14-6574
No. 14-6574 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Torrey Twane McNabb, Petitioner |
v. |
Kim T. Thomas, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | October 6, 2014 |
Linked with 14A205 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-13535) |
Decision Date: | August 28, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 3, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 18 2014 |
Application (14A205) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 1, 2014 to October 2, 2014, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Aug 22 2014 |
Application (14A205) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 2, 2014. |
Oct 2 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 5, 2014) |
Oct 21 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 5, 2014. |
Dec 5 2014 |
Brief of respondent Kim T. Thomas, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Dec 23 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Torrey Twane McNabb filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 24 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Jan 12 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|