Docket for 14-6344
No. 14-6344 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Michael Spencer Washington, Jr., Petitioner |
v. |
Oregon |
|
Docketed: | September 19, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Oregon |
Case Nos.: | (S058490) |
Decision Date: | June 19, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 16 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 20, 2014) |
Oct 14 2014 |
Brief of respondent Oregon in opposition filed. |
Oct 30 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 14, 2014. |
Nov 17 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|