Docket for 14-5803
No. 14-5803 | |
Title: |
Richard A. Haase, et ux., Petitioners |
v. |
Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | August 15, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-20806) |
Decision Date: | April 8, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 6, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 4 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 15, 2014) |
Sep 11 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
Oct 2 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014. |
Oct 20 2014 |
The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until November 10, 2014, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. |
Nov 10 2014 |
Petitioners complied with order of October 20, 2014. |
Nov 20 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 5, 2014. |
Dec 8 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|