Docket for 14-5693
No. 14-5693 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kent William Sprouse, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | August 8, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70018) |
Decision Date: | April 8, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 12, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 6 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 8, 2014) |
Sep 8 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 8, 2014. |
Oct 8 2014 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Oct 14 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Kent William Sprouse filed. |
Oct 23 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 7, 2014. |
Nov 10 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|