Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-556
No. 14-556
Vide 14-562, 14-571, 14-574
Title:
James Obergefell, et al., Petitioners
v.
Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health, et al.
Docketed:November 14, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-3057, 14-3464)
  Decision Date:November 6, 2014
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 14 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2014)
Dec 8 2014 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents.
Dec 12 2014 Brief of respondent Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health filed.
Dec 15 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Idaho Governor C.L. "Butch" Otter filed. VIDED.
Dec 15 2014 Brief amici curiae of Colage; Equality Federation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Dec 15 2014 Brief amici curiae of 76 Scholars of Marriage filed. VIDED.
Dec 19 2014 Letter from counsel for petitioners dated December 19, 2014, received waiving 14-day waiting period pursuant to Rule 15.5.
Dec 21 2014 Reply of petitioners James Obergefell, et al. filed.
Dec 23 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Jan 12 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 16, 2015.
Jan 16 2015 Petition GRANTED The petitions for writs of certiorari in No. 14-562, No. 14-571, and No. 14-574 are granted. The cases are consolidated and the petitions for writs of certiorari are granted limited to the following questions: 1) Does the Fourteenth Amendment require a state to license a marriage between two people of the same sex? 2) Does the Fourteenth Amendment require a state to recognize a marriage between two people of the same sex when their marriage was lawfully licensed and performed out-of-state? A total of ninety minutes is allotted for oral argument on Question 1. A total of one hour is allotted for oral argument on Question 2. The parties are limited to filing briefs on the merits and presenting oral argument on the questions presented in their respective petitions. The briefs of petitioners are to be filed on or before 2 p.m., Friday, February 27, 2015. The briefs of respondents are to be filed on or before 2 p.m., Friday, March 27, 2015. The reply briefs are to be filed on or before 2 p.m., Friday, April 17, 2015. VIDED
Jan 26 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Steve Beshear, et al., in No. 14-574. VIDED
Jan 26 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al., in No. 14-571. VIDED
Feb 4 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Haslam, et al., in No. 14-562. VIDED
Feb 12 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Hodges, et al., in No. 14-556. VIDED
Feb 27 2015 Joint appendix for No. 14-556, 14-562 & 14-574 filed (2 volumes). VIDED.
Feb 27 2015 Brief of petitioners James Obergefell, et al. filed.
Feb 27 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The County of Cuyahoga, Ohio filed.
Feb 27 2015 Brief amici curiae of Mae Kuykendall, David Upham and Michael Worley in support of neither party and urging affirmance on question 1 filed. VIDED.
Mar 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of Langley Hill Friends Meeting, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Columbia Law School Sexuality and Gender Law Clinic filed. VIDED.
Mar 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Outserve-Servicemembers Legal Defense Network, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Hawaii filed. VIDED.
Mar 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Indiana University filed. VIDED.
Mar 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of BiLaw filed. VIDED.
Mar 4 2015 Brief amici curiae of Services and Advocacy for Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Elders, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 4 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Cleveland Choral Arts Association Inc. a/k/a The North Coast Men's Chorus filed. VIDED.
Mar 4 2015 Brief amici curiae of Elected Officials and Former Officeholders of Michigan, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 4 2015 Brief amici curiae of Survivors of Sexual Orientation Change Therapies filed. VIDED.
Mar 4 2015 Brief amici curiae of Equality Ohio, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 4 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Professor W. Burlette Carter in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Mar 4 2015 Brief amici curiae of California Council of Churches, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of Conflict of Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of Kenneth B. Mehlman, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The American Humanist Association and Center for Inquiry filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Organization of American Historians filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Citizens United for the Individual Freedom to Define Marriage in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of 379 Employers and Organizations Representing Employers filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Alliance: State Advocates for Women's Rights and Gender Equality filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of GLMA, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Sociological Association filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Virginia filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Constitutional Rights of Children filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of National Family Civil Rights Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 6 2015 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, April 28, 2015
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of The Human Rights Campaign and 207,551 Americans filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Appendix of The Human Rights Campaign and 207,551 Americans filed. (10 Volumes) VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Kristin M. Perry, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Anti-Defamation League, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of PFLAG, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Conflict of Laws and Family Law Professors filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of The Donaldson Adoption Institute, et al. filed.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Liberty Education Forum filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of American Public Health Association, and Whitman-Walker Health filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Lawrence J. Korb, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of 167 Members of the U.S. House of Representatives, and 44 U.S. Senators filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Law Enforcement Officers, First Responders, and Organizations filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Legal Services NYC filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars Stephen Clark, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Family Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Freedom to Marry filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Separation of Church and State filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of John K. Olson filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Marriage Equality USA filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of LGBT Student Organizations at Undergraduate, Graduate, and Professional Schools filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Minnesota filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Garden State Equality filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of 226 U.S. Mayors, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Mattachine Society of Washington, D.C. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of The General Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, et al. in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Professors Laurence H. Tribe and Michael C. Dorf filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Campaign for Southern Equality and Equality Federation filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Proposal to lodge excerpts of original, declassified documents, from counsel for amicus curiae The Mattachine Society of Washington D.C. VIDE
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Douglas Laycock, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Watch and The New York City Bar Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Historians of Marriage and the American Historical Association filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Ninety-Two Plaintiffs in Marriage Cases in Alabama, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Gary J. Gates filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Foreign and Comparative Law Experts Harold Hongju Koh, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars Ashutosh Bhagwat, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Carlos A. Ball, Distinguished Professor of Law, Rutgers University, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Family Equality Council, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Experiential Learning Lab at New York University School of Law filed. VIDED.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Chris Kluwe, et al. filed.
Mar 16 2015 CIRCULATED.
Mar 17 2015 Record requested from U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Mar 17 2015 Joint letter of argument proposal from counsel for the petitioners. VIDED
Mar 17 2015 Joint letter of argument proposal from counsel for the respondents. VIDED
Mar 17 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Robert J. Bentley, Governor of Alabama filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 18 2015 Record received from U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit is electronic.
Mar 18 2015 Record from U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of Ohio is electronic and located on PACER.
Mar 26 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Paul McHugh filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 26 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Professor Daniel N. Robinson, Ph.D. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015 Brief of respondents Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015 Brief amici curiae of Scholars of History and Related Disciplines filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Ryan T. Anderson, Ph.D. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015 Brief amici curiae of Dawn Stefanowicz and Denise Shick filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015 Brief amici curiae of Heather Barwick and Katy Faust filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015 Brief amicus curiae of State of South Carolina filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015 Brief amici curiae of Robert Oscar Lopez and B.N. Klein filed. VIDED.(Distributed)
Mar 30 2015 Brief amici curiae of 54 International and Comparative Law Experts from 27 Countries filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Family Trust Foundation of Kentucky, Inc., A/K/A The Family Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2015 Brief amici curiae of The Ruth Institute and Dr. Jennifer Roback Morse, Ph.D. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2015 Brief amici curiae of North Carolina Values Coalition, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015 Supplemental joint letter of argument proposal from counsel for the petitioners. VIDED
Mar 31 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Family Research Council filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Lary S. Larson filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015 Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015 Brief amici curiae of Organizations That Promote Biological Parenting filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015 Brief amici curiae of Liberty Scholars and the Saint Thomas More Society of Dallas filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 1 2015 Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Originalism filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 1 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Parents and Friends of Gays & Ex-Gays filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 1 2015 Brief amici curiae of Wyoming Legislators and Scholars of Full Faith and Credit filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 1 2015 Brief amicus curiae of David A. Robinson filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 1 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Public Affairs Campaign and Opinion Expert Frank Schubert, et al. filed. VIDED.
Apr 1 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Algirdas M. Liepas filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 1 2015 Brief amicus curiae of National Coalition of Black Pastors and Christian Leaders filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of American College of Pediatricians, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of 100 Scholars of Marriage filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Tri Valley Law, P.C. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of Organizations and Scholars of Gender-Diverse Parenting filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Catholic Answers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of 47 Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Welfare of Women, Children, and Underprivileged Populations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of Major Religious Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of Leaders of the 2012 Republican National Convention Committee on the Platform, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of Religious Organizations, Public Speakers, and Scholars Concerned About Free Speech filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Committee for Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 2 2015 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Theodore Coates. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Upon consideration of the March 17 and March 31, 2015, letters from counsel for the petitioners and the respondents, the following order of argument is adopted. On Question 1 the time is allocated as follows: 30 minutes for one advocate on behalf of the petitioners, 15 minutes for the Solicitor General, and 45 minutes for one advocate on behalf of the respondents. On Question 2 the time is allocated as follows: 30 minutes for one advocate on behalf of the petitioners, and 30 minutes for one advocate on behalf of the respondents. VIDED
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Texas Eagle Forum and Steven F. Hotze, M.D. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Fertility and Marriage filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Richard A. Lawrence filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Mike Huckabee Policy Solutions and, Family Research Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the U.S., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of State of Alabama filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae Idaho Governor C.L. "Butch" Otter filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Earl M. Maltz, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Jason Feliciano and Seventeen Pastors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of International Conference of Evangelical Endorsers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Lighted Candle Society filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Institute for Marriage and Public Policy, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of 57 Members of U.S. Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Jon Simmons filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Texas Values filed. VIDED.(Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Dr. Judith Reisman, and Liberty Center for Child Protection filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Same-Sex Attracted Men and their Wives filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Agudath Israel of America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 17 2015 Reply of petitioners James Obergefell, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 28 2015 Argued. For petitioners on Question 1: Mary L. Bonauto, Boston, Mass.; and Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents on Question 1: John J. Bursch, Special Assistant Attorney General, Lansing, Mich. For petitioners on Question 2: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Washington, D. C. For respondents on Question 2: Joseph F. Whalen, Associate Solicitor General, Nashville, Tenn.
May 4 2015 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Theodore Coates DENIED. VIDED.
May 21 2015 Request for recusal received from amicus curiae Foundation for Moral Law. VIDED
Jun 26 2015 Judgment REVERSED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia and Thomas, JJ., joined. Scalia, J. filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas, J., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia, J., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia and Thomas, JJ., joined. VIDED
Jul 28 2015 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Alphonse A. Gerhardstein Gerhardstein & Branch Co. LPA(513) 621-0779
    Counsel of Record432 Walnut St., Suite 400
Cincinnati, OH  45202
agerhardstein@gbfirm.com
Party name: James Obergefell, et al.
 
Mary L. Bonauto Gay & Lesbian Advocates & Defenders(617) 426-1350
30 Winter Street
Suite 800
Boston, MA  02108
mbonauto@glad.com
Party name: James Obergefell, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Eric E. Murphy State Solicitor(614) 466-8980
    Counsel of Record Office of the Attorney General
30 East Broad Street, 17th Fl.
Columbus, OH  43215-3428
eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
Party name: Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health, et al.
Other:
Algert S. Agricola Jr. Ryals, Donaldson & Agricola, P.C.(334) 834-5290
60 Commerce Street, Suite 1400
Montgomery, AL  36104
aagricola@rdafirm.com
Party name: Robert J. Bentley, Governor of Alabama
 
Cristina Alonso Carlton, Fields, Jorden, Burt, P.A. (305)-530-0050
100 Southeast Second Street, Suite 4200
Miami, FL  33131
calonso@cfjblaw.com
Party name: Campaign for Southren Equality and Equality Federation
 
J. Scott Ballenger Latham & Watkins LLP(202) 637-2200
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC  20004
scott.ballenger@lw.com
Party name: Gary J.Gates
 
Richard D. Bernstein Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP(202) 303-1108
1875 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
rbernstein@willkie.com
Party name: Ninety-Two Plaintiffs in Marriage Cases in Alabama, et al.
 
Boris Bershteyn Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP212-735-3834
Four Times Square
New York, NY  10036
boris.bershteyn@skadden.com
Party name: American Health Association, and Whitman -Walker
 
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr. Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton(212) 225-2000
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY  10006
cboccuzzi@cgsh.com
Party name: American Sociological Association
 
Blithe Smith Bock City Attorney of the City Los Angeles(213) 978-6936
200 North Main Street
600 City Hall East
Los Angeles, CA  90012
blithe.bock@lacity.org
Party name: 226 U.S. Mayors, et al.
 
James Bopp Jr. James Madison Center for Free Speech(812) 232-2434
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN  47807
jboppjr@aol.com
Party name: Leaders of the 2012 Republican National Convention Committee on the Platform, et al.
 
Ruth N. Borenstein Morrison & Foerster LLP(415) 268-7000
425 Market Street
San Francisco, CA  94105
RBorenstein@mofo.com
Party name: Foreign and Comparative Law Experts Harold Honju Koh, et al.
 
David C. Boyle P.O. Box 15143 (734)-904-6132
Long Beach, CA  90815
dbo@boyleslaw.org
Party name: David Boyle
 
Gerard V. Bradley 3156 Eck Hall (574)-631-8385
Notre Dame, IN  46556
gerard.v.bradley.16@nd.edu
Party name: Dr. Paul McHugh
 
Andrew L. Brasher Solicitor General(334) 242-7300
Office of Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL  36130
abrasher@ago.state.al.us
Party name: State of Alabama
 
Dean R. Broyles National Center for Law & Policy(760)-747-4529
539 West Grand Avenue
Escondido, CA  92025
dbroyles@nclplaw.org
Party name: Parents and Friends of Gays & Ex-Gays
 
G. Eric Brunstad Jr. Dechert LLP(860) 524-3999
90 State House Square
Hartford, CT  06103
eric.brunstad@dechert.com
Party name: John K. Olson
 
Martin N. Buchanan Law Offices of Martin N. Buchanan(619) 238-2426
655 West Broadway, Suite 1700
San Diego, CA  92101
martin@martinbuchanan.com
Party name: Marriage Equality USA
 
John J. Bursch Special Assistant Attorney General(517) 373-1110
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI  48909
MIAG@michigan.gov
Party name: James Obergefell, et al. v. Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health, et al.
 
Douglas J. Callahan 242 W. Caroline Street (800) 385-0601
Fenton, MI  48430-0000
doug.callahan@nfcrc.org
Party name: National Family Civil Rights Center
 
Jacob Daniel Campion Office of the Attorney General651-757-1459
445 Minnesota Street, Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN  55101-2128
jacob.campion@ag.state.mn.us
Party name: Minnesota
 
Daniel J. Canon Clay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC(502) 561-2005 x216
101 Meidinger Tower
462 South 4th Street, Suite 101
Louisville, KY  40202
dan@justiceky.com
Party name: Bourke, et al.
 
Hunter Thompson Carter Arent Fox, LLP(212) 484-3900
1675 Broadway, 34th Floor
New York, NY  10019
hunter.carter@arentfox.com
Party name: Law Enforcement Officers, First Responders and Organizations
 
Willieta Burlette Carter George Washington University Law School202 994-5155
2000 H Street, NW
Washington, DC  20052
bcarter@law.gwu.edu
Party name: Professor W. Burlette Carter
 
Stanton L. Cave P.O. Box 910457(859) 309-3000
Lexington, KY  40591-0457
stan.cave@stancavelaw.com
Party name: Family Trust Foundation of Kentucky, Inc., A/K/A The Family Foundation
 
Theodore Coates 5994 South Holly Street(720) 393-8646
Suite 158
Greenwood Village, CO  80111
coates0603@msn.com
Party name: Theodore Coates
 
Sean J. Coletti 428 Park Avenue 208-523-4445
ldaho Falls, ID  83402
seancoletti@hopkinsroden.com
Party name: Lary S. Larson
 
Teresa Stanton Collett University of St. Thomas School of Law(651) 962-4973
MSL 400
1000 LaSalle Avenue
Minneapolis, MN  55403-2015
tscollett@stthomas.edu
Party name: Institute for Marriage and Public Policy, et al.
 
Robert D. Cook Solicitor General(803) 734-3970
P.O. Box 11549
Columbia, SC  29202-1549
BCook@scag.gov
Party name: State of South Carolina
 
Charles J. Cooper Cooper & Kirk, PLLC(202) 220-9600
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Party name: Scholars of History and Related Disciplines
 
Andrew J. Davis Folger Levin LLP(415)-625-1050
199 Fremont Street, 20th Floor
San Francisco, CA  94105
ddavis@folgerlevin.com
Party name: PFLAG, Inc,
 
Peggy Cooper Davis New York University School of Law(212) 998-6465
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY  10012
davisp@mercury.law.nyu.edu
Party name: Experiential Learning Lab at New York University School of Law
 
Walter Dellinger O'Melveny & Myers LLP(202) 383-5319
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
wdellinger@omm.com
Party name: Freedom to Marry
 
Deborah Dewart 620 E. Sabiston Drive (910)-326-4554
Swansboro, NC  28584-9674
debcpalaw@earthlink.net
Party name: North Carolina Values Coalition, et al.
 
Gregory L. Diskant Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP(212) 336-2000
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036
gldiskant@pbwt.com
Party name: Elected Officials and Former Officeholders of Michigan, et al.
 
Herbert K. Doby 215 East 21st Avenue(307) 532-2700
PO Box 130
Torrington, WY  82240
nhibben@dobyhidden.com
Party name: Wyoming Legislators and Scholars of Full Faith and Credit
 
John A. Dragseth Fish & Richardson, P.C., P.A.(612) 335-5070
3200 RBC Plaza
60 South 6th Street
Minneapolis, MN  55402
dragseth@fr.com
Party name: Chris Kluwe, et al.
 
S. Kyle Duncan Duncan PLLC(202) 714-9492
1629 K Street, N.W., Suite 300
Washington, DC  20006
kduncan@duncanpllc.com
Party name: Louisiana, et al.
 
William C. Duncan Marriage Law Foundation(801)-367-4570
1868 N 800 E
Lehi, UT  84043
duncanw@marriagelawfoundation.org
Party name: Scholars of Originalism
 
Alexander Dushku 1800 World Trade Center(801) 328-3600
60 East South Temple Suite 1800
Salt Lake City, UT  84111
adushku@kmclaw.com
Party name: Major Religious Organizations
 
John C. Eastman Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence(714) 628-2587
c/o Chapman University School of Law
One University Drive
Orange, CA  92866
jeastman@chapman.edu
Party name: Public Affairs Campaign and Opinion Expert Frank Schubert, et al.
 
John A. Eidsmoe Foundation for Moral Law(334) 262-1245
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL  36104
eidsmoeja@juno.com
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
 
Craig Engle Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn(202) 857-6000
1717 K Street
Washington, DC  20036-5339
craig.engle@arentfox.com
Party name: The Liberty Education Forum
 
William N. Eskridge Jr. Yale Law School(203)-432-9056
PO Box 208215
New Haven, CT  06520
william.eskridge@yale.edu
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
 
Steven W. Fitschen The National Legal Foundation(757)-463-6133
2224 Virginia Beach Blvd.
Suite 204
Virginia Beach, VA  23454
nlf@nlf.net
Party name: Concerned Women for America
 
Marjory Anne Gentry Three Embarcadero Center415-471-3365
10th Floor
San Francisco, CA  94111
Marjory.Gentry@aporter.com
Party name: Conflict of Laws and Family Law Professors
 
Robert P. George Robinson & McElwee(609) 258-3270
500 Virginia Street East, Suite 400
Charleston, WV  25326
rgeorge@princeton.edu
Party name: 47 Scholars
 
Sandra F. Gilbert 3020 Garland Ave.(612) 715-5049
Plymouth, MN  55447
SandyFGilbert@msn.com
Party name: Jason Feliciano and Seventeen Pastors
 
Patrick T. Gillen Ave Maria School of Law(734) 355-4728
1025 Commons Circle
Naples, FL  34119
ptgillen@avemarialaw.edu
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
 
Shannon Lee Goessling Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.(770) 977-2131
2255 Sewell Mill Rd., Suite 320
Marietta, GA  30062
shannon@southeasternlegal.org
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
 
Suzanne B. Goldberg Columbia Law School(212) 854-0411
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY  10027
sgoldb1@law.columbia.edu
Party name: Columbia Law School Sexuality and Gender Law Clinic
 
Kevin E. Green 456 N. Meridian Street, #1517(317) 437-5002
Indianapolis, IN  46204
keglegal@aol.com
Party name: Jon Simmons
 
Marc A. Greendorfer Tri Valley Law PC(925) 328-0128
2410 Camino Ramon
Suite 122
San Ramon, CA  94583
marc@trivalleylaw.com
Party name: Tri Valley Law, P.C.
 
Herbert G. Grey 4800 S.W. Griffth Drive, Suite 320(503) 641-4908
Beaverton, OR  97005
herb@greylaw.org
Party name: Earl M. Maltz, et al.
 
Joseph R. Guerra Sidley Austin LLP(202) 736-8000
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
jguerra@sidley.com
Party name: Lawrence J. Korb, et al.
 
Paul J. Hall DLA Piper LLP (US)(415) 836-2500
555 Mission Street, Suite 2400
San Francisco, CA  94105-2933
paul.hall@dlapiper.com
Party name: Carlos A. Ball, Distinguished Professor of Law, Rutgers University, et al.
 
Douglas Hallward-Driemeier Ropes & Gray LLP(202) 508-4600
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20006
Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
Party name: Tanco, et al.
 
Elizabeth L. Hileman Hileman & Associates, P.C.(301) 652-1448
7979 Old Georgetown Rd., Suite 600
Bethesda, MD  20814
ehileman@hilemanlaw.com
Party name: The American Humanist Association and Center for Inquiry
 
Matthew Michael Hoffman Goodwin Procter LLP(202)-346-4000
901 New York Avenue N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
mhoffman@goodwinprocter.com
Party name: Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et al.
 
Eric A. Isaacson Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP(619) 231-1058
655 West Broadway, Suite 1900
San Diego, CA  92101
erici@rgrdlaw.com
Party name: California Council of Churches, et al.
 
Darrin K. Johns Law Firm of Darrin K. Johns PC(801) 228-7521
12 West ,100 North Suite-F
American Fork, UT  84003
darrin.johns@darrinjohnslaw.com
Party name: Same-Sex Attracted Men and their Wives
 
Lawrence J. Joseph 1250 Connecticut Ave., NW(202) 355-9452
Suite 200
Washington, DC  20036
lj@larryjoseph.com
Party name: Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund in support of neither party
 
Roberta A. Kaplan Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP(212) 373-3000
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10019-6064
rkaplan@paulweiss.com
Party name: The Human Rights Campaign and 207, 551 Americans
 
Harlan Daniel Karp 850 Euclid Ave., #1330(216) 685-1360
Cleveland, OH  44114
harlankarp@gmail.com
Party name: The Cleveland Choral Arts Association Inc. a/k/a The North Coast Men's Chorus
 
Meir Katz The Berkman Law Office(718) 855-3627
111 Livingston Street
Suite1928
Brooklyn, NY  11201
mkatz@berkmanlaw.com
Party name: The Committee for Justice
 
Katherine Keating Bryan Cave LLP(415) 675-3400
560 Mission Street, 25th Floor
San Francisco, CA  94105-2994
katherine.keating@bryancave.com
Party name: Family Equality Council, et al.
 
Mae Kuykendall Michigan State University(517) 432-6894
648 N. Shaw Lane Rm. 366
East Lansing, MI  48824
kuykend1@law.msu.edu
Party name: Mae Kuykendall, David Upham and Michael Worley
 
Sharee S. Langenstein P.O. Box 141 (855) 694-8671
Murphysboro, IL  62966
shareelangenstein@yahoo.com
Party name: The Ruth Institute and Dr. Jennifer Roback Morse, Ph.D.
 
Jon Laramore Faegre Baker Daniels(317) 237-0300
300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2700
Indianapolis, IN  46204
jon.laramore@faegrebd.com
Party name: Indiana University
 
Leigh Gross Latherow VanAntwerp, Monge, Jones, Edwards & McCann, LLP(606) 329-2929
P.O. Box 1111
Ashland, KY  41105
llatherow@vmje.com
Party name: Beshear, et al.
 
Girard D. Lau Deputy Attorney General(808) 586-1360
Department of the Attorney General
425 Queen Street
Honolulu, HI  96813
girard.d.lau@hawaii.gov
Party name: Hawaii
 
Richard A. Lawrence 608 South Hull Street(334) 263-2000
Montgomery, AL  36104
richard@rlawrencelaw.com
Party name: Richard A. Lawrence
 
Douglas Laycock University of Virginia School of Law(434) 243-8546
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA  22903
dlaycock@virginia.edu
Party name: Douglas Laycock, et al.
 
Richard L. Levine Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP(212) 310-8286
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY  10153
richard.levine@weil.com
Party name: Human Rights Watch and The New York City Bar Association, et al.
 
Algirdas M. Liepas 4025 Automation Way, Suite C4 North 970-493-3359
Fort Collins, CO  80525
algirdas@liepas.com
Party name: Algirdas M. Liepas
 
David S. Lill Lill FirmPC(512) 330-0252
4407 Bee Caves Road
Suite 111, Building 1
Austin, TX  78746
david@lillfirm.com
Party name: Texas Values
 
Charles S. Limandri Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund(858) 759-9948
PO Box 9520
Rancho Santa Fe, CA  92067
cslimandri@limandri.com
Party name: Catholic Answers
 
Aaron D. Lindstrom Solicitor General(517) 373-1124
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI  48909
LindstromA@michigan.gov
Party name: Snyder, et al.
 
Paul Benjamin Linton Special Counsel(847) 291-3848
Thomas More Society
921 Keystone Avenue
Northbrook, IL  60062
PBLCONLAW@AOL.COM
Party name: Family Research Council
 
Larry S. Loigman P.O. Box 97(732) 539-0550
Middletown, NJ  07748
loigman@verizon.net
Party name: Agudath Israel of America
 
Joseph Patrick Lombardo Chapman and Cutler, LLP312-845-3428
111 W. Monroe Street
Chicago, IL  60603
lombardo@chapman.com
Party name: Legal Scholars Stephen Clark, et al.
 
Robert A. Long Jr. Covington & Burling LLP(202) 662-6000
OneCity Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC  20004-2401
rlong@cov.com
Party name: Conflict of Law Scholars
 
Lawrence S. Lustberg Gibbons P.C. (973) 596-4731
One Gateway Center
Newark, NJ  07102-5310
llustberg@gibbonslaw.com
Party name: Garden State Equality
 
Majeed G. Makhlouf Cuyahoga County Department of Law(216) 698-6464
2079 East 9th St., 7th Fl.
Cleveland, OH  44115
mmakhlouf@cuyahogacounty.us
Party name: The County of Cuyahoga, Ohio
 
Christopher D. Man Chadbourne & Parke LLP(202) 974-5600
1200 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
cman@chadbourne.com
Party name: Outserve-Servicemembers Legal Defense Network, et al.
 
Susan Leann Baker Manning Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP(202) 373-6000
2020 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
susan.manning@morganlewis.com
Party name: 379 Employers and Organizations Representing Employers
 
Emily J. Martin National Women's Law Center(202)-588-5180
11 Dupont Circle, NW, Suite 800
Washington, DC  20036
emartin@nwlc.org
Party name: National Women's Law Center, et al.
 
Lori Alvino McGill Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP(202) 538-8000
777 6th Street, NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC  20001-3706
lorialvinomcgill@quinnemanuel.com
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars Ashutosh Bhagwat, et al.
 
Robert J. McNamara 901 N Glebe Road(703)-682-9320
Suite 900
Arlington, VA  22203
rmcnamara@ij.org
Party name: Institute for Justice
 
J. E. McNeil McNeil & Ricks, PC(202) 256-7441
4119 Garrison St., N.W.
Washington, DC  20016
jmcnrick@yahoo.com
Party name: Langley Hill Friends Meeting, et al.
 
Andrew Melzer Sanford Heisler Kimpel, LLP(646) 402-5657
1350 Avenue of the Americas 31st Floor
New York, NY  10019
amelzer@sanfordheisler.com
Party name: LGBT Student Organizations at Undergraduate, Graduate and Professional Schools
 
Jonathan B. Miller Office of the Attorney General(617) 727-2200
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA  02108
jonathan.miller@state.ma.us
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
 
Alan B. Morrison George Washington University Law School(202) 994-7120
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC  20052
abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
Party name: Equality Ohio, et al.
 
Jonathan Jacob Nadler Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP(202) 457-6016
2550 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20037
jack.nadler@squirepb.com
Party name: Services and Advocacy for Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Elders, et al.
 
Alice M. O'Brien National Education Association(202) 822-7035
1201 16th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
aobrien@nea.org
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
 
Nicholas M. O'Donnell Sullivan & Worcester LLP(617)-338-28
One Post Office Square
Boston, MA  02109
nodonnell@sandw.com
Party name: GLMA
 
Theodore B. Olson Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP(202) 955-8500
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
tolson@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Kristin M. Perry, et al.
 
William J. Olson William J.Olson, P.C.(703) 356-5070
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA  22180-5615
wjo@mindspring.com
Party name: Public Advocate of the U.S., et al.
 
Gregory E. Ostfeld Greenberg Traurig LLP(312)-476-5056
77 W. Wacker Drive
Suite 3100
Chicago, IL  60601
ostfeld@gtlaw.com
Party name: Anti-Defamation League, et al.
 
Kathleen M. O'Sullivan Perkins Coie, LLP(206) 359-8000
1201 Third Avenue, 48th Floor
Suite 4900
Seattle, WA  98101-3099
kosullivan@perkinscoie.com
Party name: The AllIance: State Advocates for Woman's Rights and Gender Equality
 
Owen C. Pell White & Case, LLP(212) 819-8200
1155 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036-2787
opell@whitecase.com
Party name: Legal Services NYC
 
James F. Peterson Judicial Watch, Inc(202) 646-5172
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC  20024
jpeterson@juducualwatch.org
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
 
Anthony R. Picarello Jr. U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops(202) 541-3300
3211 Fourth Street, N.E.
Washington, DC  20017
apicarello@usccb.org
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops
 
Andrew P. Pugno 8261 Greenback Lane Suite 200916 608-3065
Fair Oaks, CA  95628-2533
andrew@pugnolaw.com
Party name: ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, et al.
 
Stuart A. Raphael Solicitor General of Virginia(804) 786-7240
Office of the Attorney General
900 East Main Street
Richmond, VA  23219
sraphael@oag.state.va.us
Party name: Virginia
 
Eric C. Rassbach Becket Fund for Religious Liberty(202) 955-0095
1200 New Hampshire Ave., Ste. 700
Washington, DC  20036
erassbach@becketfund.org
Party name: The General Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, et al.
 
David A. Robinson P.O. Box 780 (203) 214-4078
North Haven, CT  06473
david@davidalanrobinson.com
Party name: David A. Robinson
 
Sanford Jay Rosen Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld, LLP(415) 433-6830
50 Fremont Street
Nineteenth Floor
San Francisco, CA  94104-1823
srosen@rbgg.com
Party name: Survivors of Sexual Orientation Change Therapies
 
E. Joshua Rosenkranz Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP(212) 506-5380
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY  10019-6142
jrosenkranz@orrick.com
Party name: Family Law Scholars
 
Jerome C. Roth Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP(415) 512-4000
560 Mission Street, 27th Fl.
San Francisco, CA  94105
jerome.roth@mto.com
Party name: Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, et al.
 
Charles A. Rothfeld Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3000
1999 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Curch and State
 
D. John Sauer Clark & Sauer LLC(314)-332-2980
7733 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 625
St. Louis, MO  63105
jsauer@clarksauer.com
Party name: 57 Members of U.S. Congress
 
Gene C. Schaerr Law Offices of Gene C. Schaerr(202) 361-1061
332 Constitution Avenue NE
Washington, DC  20002
gschaerr@gmail.com
Party name: Idaho Governor C.L. "Butch" Otter
 
Gene Clayton Schaerr Law Offices of Gene Schaerr(202)-361-1061
332 Constitution Avenue NE
Washington, DC  20002
gschaerr@gmail.com
Party name: 76 Scholars of Marriage
 
Andrew L. Schlafly 939 Old Chester Road(908) 719-8608
Far Hills, NJ  07931
aschlafly@aol.com
Party name: Texas Eagle Forum and Steven F. Hotze, M.D.
 
John Paul Schnapper-Casteras NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund(202) 682-1300
1444 I Street NW
Washington, DC  20005
jschnapper@naacpldf.org
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al.
 
Arthur A. Schulcz Sr. Chaplains' Counsel PLLC(703) 645-4010
21043 Honeycreeper PL.
Leesburg, VA  20175
art@chaplainscounsel.com
Party name: International Conference of Evangelical Endorsers
 
Kelly J. Shackelford Liberty Institute(972) 941-4444
2001 W. Plano Parkway, Suite 1600
Plano, TX  75075
kshackford@libertyinstitute.org
Party name: Religious Organizations, Public Speakers, and Scholars Concerned About Free Speech
 
Pratik A. Shah Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP(202) 887-4000
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20036
pshah@akingump.com
Party name: Historians of Marriage, and the American Historical Association
 
Benjamin G. Shatz Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP(310) 312-4000
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angles, CA  90064-1632
bshatz@manatt.com
Party name: Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic
 
Catherine E. Smith 2255 E. Evans Ave. (303) 871-6180
Denver, CO  80208
c.smith@law.du.edu
Party name: Scholars of the Constitutional Rights of Children
 
Michael F. Smith The Smith Appellate Law Firm(202) 454-2860
1717 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC  20006
smith@smithpllc.com
Party name: Ryan T. Anderson, Ph.D.
 
Paul M. Smith Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6060
1099 New York Avenue, N.W.
Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
psmith@jenner.com
Party name: American Psychological Association, et al.
 
Kevin T. Snider Pacific Justice Institute(916) 857-6900
P.O. Box 276600
Sacramento, CA  95823
ksnider@pji.org
Party name: Professor Daniel N. Robinson, Ph.D.
 
Carole M. Stanyar 221 N. Main Street(313) 819-3953
Suite 300
Ann Arbor, MI  48104
cstanyar@wowway.com
Party name: DeBoer, et al.
 
Mathew D. Staver Liberty Counsel(800) 671-1776
P.O. Box 540774
Orlando, FL  32854
court@lc.org
Party name: Dr. Judith Reisman, and Liberty Center for Child Protection
 
Catherine E. Stetson Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5491
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
Party name: The Organization of American Historians
 
D'Arcy Winston Straub 6772 W. Ida Dr. #327 303-794-4109
Littleton, CO  80123
darcystraub@gmail.com
Party name: Citizens United for the Individual Freedom to Define Marriage
 
Timothy N. Tardibono Family Policy Institute of Oklahoma(405) 664-6514
P.O. Box 1097
Family Policy Institute of Oklahoma
P.O. Box 1097
Bethany, OK  73008
info@okfamily.org
Party name: Organizations That Promote Biological Parenting
 
James R Tate Tate, Bywater, Fuller, Mickelsen & Tull, PLC(703) 938-5100
2740 Chain Bridge Rd.
Vienna, VA  22181
jtate@tatebywater.com
Party name: Scholars of Fertility and Marriage
 
Paul M. Thompson McDermott Will & Emery LLP(202) 756-8000
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC  20001
pthompson@mwe.com
Party name: The Mattachine Society of Washington, D.C.
 
Richard Thompson Thomas More Law Center(734) 827-2001
24 Frank Lloyd Wright Drive
P.O. Box 393
Ann Arbor, MI  48106
rthompson@thomasmore.org
Party name: National Coalition of Black Pastors and Christian Leaders
 
Aaron Michael Tidman Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popper PC(202) 434-7300
701 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20004
amtidman@mintz.com
Party name: The Donaldson Adoption Institute, et al.
 
Jeffrey S. Trachtman Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP(212) 715-9100
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036
jtrachtman@kramerlevin.com
Party name: President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al.
 
Edward H. Trent 550 W. Main Avenue, Suite 900 (865) 546-1000
Knoxville, TN  37902
etrent@wimberlylawson.com
Party name: Organizations and Scholars of Gender-diverse Parenting
 
Joseph F. Tringali Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP(212) 455-2000
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY  10017
jtringali@stblaw.com
Party name: 167 Members of the U.S. House of Representatives, and 44 U.S. Senators
 
David R. Upham University of Dallas(972) 721-5186
1845 East Northgaate Drive
Irving, TX  75062-4736
davidrupham@yahoo.com
Party name: Liberty Scholars and the Saint Thomas More Society of Dallas
 
Kyle Courtenay Velte University of Denver Sturm College of Law(720) 648-9266
2255 E. Evans Ave., Room 365L
Denver, CO  80208
kyle.velte@gmail.com
Party name: BiLaw
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
 
Brian Christopher Vertz Pollock Begg Komar Glasser & Vertz, LLC(412) 471-9000
437 Grant Street, Suite 501
Pittsburgh, PA  15219
bvertz@pollockbegg.com
Party name: American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers, et al.
 
David C. Walker 2000 S. Colorado Blvd. 303-329-3363
Tower 2, Suite 700
Denver, CO  80222
dwalker@bbdfirm.com
Party name: American College of Pediatricians, et al.
 
James J. Walsh BODMAN PLC(313) 259-7777
1901 St. Antoine Street
Detroit, MI  48226
jwalsh@bodmanlaw.com
Party name: Michigan Catholic Conference
 
Lynn D. Wardle J. Reuben Clark Law School(801) 422-6842
452 JRCB
Provo, UT  84602
wardlel@law.byu.edu
Party name: 54 International and Comparative Law Experts from 27 Countries
 
Seth P. Waxman Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Kenneth B. Mehlman, et al.
 
George M. Weaver Hollberg & Weaver, LLP(404) 760-1116
2921 Piedmont Road, N. E.
Suite C
Atlanta, GA  30305
gweaver@hw-law.com
Party name: Lighted Candle Society
 
Joseph F. Whalen Associate Solicitor General(615) 741-3499
Office of the Attorney General
425 Fifth Avenue North
Nashville, TN  37243
joe.whalen@ag.tn.gov
Party name: Haslam, et al.
 
Jeffrey S. Wittenbrink Rowe Law Firm, L.L.C.(225) 293-8787
5157 Bluebonnet Blvd.
Baton Rouge, LA  70809
Party name: Mike Huckabee Policy Solutions and, Family Research Institute
 
Christopher J. Wright Harris Wiltshire & Grannis LLP(202) 730-1300
1919 M Street NW
Eighth Floor
Washington, DC  20036
cwright@hwglaw.com
Party name: Professors Laurence H. Tribe and Michael C. Dorf
 
Elizabeth B. Wydra Constitutional Accountability Center(202) 296-6889
1200 18th St., N.W., Suite 501
Washington, DC  20036
elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
July 02, 2016 | Version 2014.1