Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-525
No. 14-525
Title:
Nick Coons, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jacob J. Lew, Secretary of the Treasury, et al.
Docketed:November 10, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-15324)
  Decision Date:August 7, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 5 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2014)
Dec 5 2014 Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Dec 10 2014 Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.
Dec 10 2014 Waiver of right of respondents Jacob J. Lew, Secretary of the Treasury, et al. to respond filed.
Dec 17 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Dec 22 2014 Response Requested . (Due January 21, 2015)
Jan 13 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 20, 2015.
Feb 20 2015 Brief of respondents Jacob J. Lew, Secretary of the Treasury, et al. in opposition filed.
Mar 10 2015 Reply of petitioners Nick Coons, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 11 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015.
Mar 30 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Christina Sandefur Goldwater Institute(602) 462-5000
Scharf-Norton Center for Constitutional Litigation
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ  85004
litigation@goldwaterinstitute.org
Party name: Nick Coons, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Jacob J. Lew, Secretary of the Treasury, et al.
Other:
Peter J. Ferrara 20594 Woodmere Court(703)-582-8466
Sterling, VA  20165
peterferrara@msn.com
Party name: American Civil Rights Union
 
Timothy Sandefur Pacific Legal Foundation(916)-419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
tms@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.
May 31, 2016 | Version 2014.1