Docket for 14-457
No. 14-457 | |
Title: |
Robert King, Petitioner |
v. |
Wade McCree |
|
Docketed: | October 21, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-2033) |
Decision Date: | July 21, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 17 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2014) |
Oct 31 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 22, 2014. |
Dec 18 2014 |
Brief of respondent Wade McCree in opposition filed. |
Jan 7 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 23, 2015. |
Jan 26 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|