~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 8 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 10, 2014) |
Nov 13 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Noemi Landrau Rivera, Chapter 7 Trustee of Atlas IT Export Corp. to respond filed. |
Nov 19 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 5, 2014. |
Nov 20 2014 |
Response Requested . (Due December 22, 2014) |
Dec 19 2014 |
Brief of respondent Noemi Landrau Rivera, Chapter 7 Trustee of Atlas IT Export Corp. in opposition filed. |
Dec 29 2014 |
Letter of petitioner Pinpoint IT Services, LLC filed. |
Jan 7 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 23, 2015. |
Jan 8 2015 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Pinpoint IT Services, LLC filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 17 2015 |
Stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
Apr 17 2015 |
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |