Docket for 14-284
No. 14-284 | |
Title: |
William Humble, Director, Arizona Department of Health Services, Petitioner |
v. |
Planned Parenthood Arizona, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 10, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-15624) |
Decision Date: | June 3, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 2 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2014) |
Sep 30 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 10, 2014, for all respondents. |
Oct 10 2014 |
Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. filed. |
Oct 10 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of Oklahoma, et al. filed. |
Oct 10 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of 38 Arizona Legislators filed. |
Oct 10 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of Women Injured by RU-486, et al. filed. |
Nov 10 2014 |
Brief of respondents Planned Parenthood Arizona, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Nov 19 2014 |
Reply of petitioner William Humble, Director, Arizona Department of Health Services filed. |
Nov 25 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 12, 2014. |
Dec 15 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Robert L. Ellman |
Solicitor General | (602) 542-8986 |
|
Office of the Arizona Attorney General | |
| 1275 West Washington Street | |
| Phoenix, AZ 85007-2997 | |
| robert.ellman@azag.gov |
Party name: William Humble, Director, Arizona Department of Health Services |
Attorneys for Respondents: | | |
Helene T. Krasnoff |
Planned Parenthood of America | (202) 973-4800 |
Counsel of Record | 1110 Vermont Avenue NW | |
| Suite 300 | |
| Washington, DC 20005 | |
| helene.krasnoff@ppfa.org |
Party name: Planned Parenthood Arizona, Inc., et al. |
Other: | | |
Lawrence J. Joseph |
1250 Connecticut Ave., NW | (202) 699-1339 |
| Suite 200 | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
| ljoseph@larryjoseph.com |
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. |
| | |
Linda Boston Schlueter |
Trinity Legal Center | (210) 697-8202 |
| 11120 Wurzbach, Suite 206 | |
| San Antonio, TX 78230 | |
| TLC4Linda@aol.com |
Party name: Women Injured by RU-486, et al. |
| | |
Mailee R. Smith |
Americans United for Life | (312)-492-7234 |
| 655 15th Street, NW | |
| Suite 410 | |
| Washington, DC 20005 | |
| Mailee.Smith@AUL.org |
Party name: 38 Arizona Legislators |
| | |
Patrick R. Wyrick |
Solicitor General | (405) 521-3921 |
|
Office of the Attorney General | |
| 313 NE 21st Street | |
| Oklahoma City, OK 73105 | |
| patrick.wyrick@oag.ok.gov |
Party name: Oklahoma, et al. |