Docket for 14-1530
No. 14-1530 | |
Title: |
Turnberry/MGM Grand Towers, LLC, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Mary Ann Sussex, et al. |
|
Docketed: | June 26, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-70158) |
Decision Date: | January 27, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 27, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 25 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2015) |
Jul 27 2015 |
Brief of respondents Mary Ann Sussex, et al. in opposition filed. |
Aug 11 2015 |
Reply of petitioners Turnberry/MGM Grand Towers, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Aug 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|