~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 27 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2015) |
Jun 30 2015 |
Brief amicus curiae of Nevada filed. |
Jul 1 2015 |
Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. |
Jul 1 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Jul 8 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Jul 14 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due August 13, 2015) |
Aug 4 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 14, 2015. |
Sep 11 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Oct 16 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Ministerio Roca Solida, Inc. filed. |
Oct 21 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2015. |
Nov 9 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |