Docket for 14-1312
No. 14-1312 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Brandon Astor Jones, Petitioner |
v. |
Bruce Chatman, Warden |
|
Docketed: | May 4, 2015 |
Linked with 14A860 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-14774) |
Decision Date: | March 20, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 1, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 10 2015 |
Application (14A860) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Feb 19 2015 |
Application (14A860) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 30, 2015. |
Apr 29 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2015) |
Jun 3 2015 |
Brief of respondent Bruce Chatman, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jun 16 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Brandon Astor Jones filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 17 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Sep 4 2015 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Brandon Astor Jones filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
Oct 29 2015 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Nov 4 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015. |
Nov 5 2015 |
Letter, dated November 3, 2015, received from counsel for the petitioner. (Distributed) |
Nov 30 2015 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
|