Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-1146
No. 14-1146
Title:
Tyson Foods, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Peg Bouaphakeo, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Docketed:March 20, 2015
Linked with 14A816
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-3753)
  Decision Date:August 25, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:November 19, 2014
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 26 2015 Application (14A816) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 17, 2015 to March 19, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito.
Jan 29 2015 Application (14A816) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 19, 2015.
Mar 19 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2015)
Mar 24 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from cousel for the petitioner
Mar 24 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent.
Apr 13 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 27, 2015.
Apr 14 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of niether party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Apr 20 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The National Chicken Council filed.
Apr 20 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed.
Apr 20 2015 Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Apr 20 2015 Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Poultry & Egg Association filed.
Apr 20 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Apr 20 2015 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed.
Apr 20 2015 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Apr 27 2015 Brief of respondents Peg Bouaphakeo, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated in opposition filed.
May 11 2015 Reply of petitioner Tyson Foods, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
May 12 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2015.
May 26 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2015.
Jun 1 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 4, 2015.
Jun 8 2015 Petition GRANTED.
Jun 12 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of niether party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Jun 23 2015 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 7, 2015.
Jun 23 2015 The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 22, 2015.
Jul 13 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents.
Aug 7 2015 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Aug 7 2015 Brief of petitioner Tyson Foods, Inc. filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure Scholars in support of neither party filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Railroads filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Data Industry Association filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Dow Chemical Company filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Trans Union LLC filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation and The International Association of Defense Counsel filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Sep 9 2015 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 10, 2015
Sep 10 2015 Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Sep 21 2015 Record received from U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit. (1 Box )
Sep 22 2015 Brief of respondents Peg Bouaphakeo, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated filed.
Sep 28 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice, P.C. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 CIRCULATED
Sep 29 2015 Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Sep 29 2015 Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure Professors filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Independent Business Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amici curiae of Economists and Other Social Scientists filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Braun and Hummel filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amici curiae of Impact Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amici curiae of Complex Litigation Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amicus curiae of United Food and Commercial Workers International Union filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amici curiae of Urethanes Plaintiffs filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amici curiae of Illinois, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2015 Brief amici curiae of Professors Alexandra D. Lahav & Sachin S. Pandya filed. (Distributed)
Oct 9 2015 Record received from U.S.D.C. Northern Dist. of Iowa, the record is electronic and SEALED.
Oct 19 2015 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 21 2015 Reply of petitioner Tyson Foods, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 10 2015 Argued. For petitioner: Carter G. Phillips, Washington, D. C. For respondents: David C. Frederick, Washington, D. C.; and Elizabeth Prelogar, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Mar 22 2016 Judgment is affirmed and case remanded. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Alito, J., joined as to Part II. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Alito, J., joined.
Apr 25 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Carter G. Phillips Sidley Austin LLP(202) 736-8270
    Counsel of Record1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
cphillips@sidley.com
Party name: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Scott Michelman Public Citizen Litigation Group(202) 588-1000
    Counsel of Record1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC  20009
smichelman@citizen.org
Party name: Peg Bouaphakeo, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
 
David C. Frederick Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.(202) 326-7900
1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC  20036
dfrederick@khhte.com
Party name: Peg Bouaphakeo, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Other:
J. Scott Ballenger Latham & Watkins LLP(202) 637-2145
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC  20004
scott.ballenger@lw.com
Party name: Association of American Railroads
 
John H. Beisner Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP(202) 371-7000
1440 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20005
John.Beisner@skadden.com
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
 
Timothy S. Bishop Mayer Brown LLP(312) 782-0600
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL  60606
tbishop@mayerbrown.com
Party name: Dow Chemical Company
 
Anastasia P. Boden 930 G Street (916) 419-7111
Sacramento, CA  95814
apb@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
 
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP(213) 229-7000
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA  90071
tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
 
Paul D. Clement Bancroft PLLC(202) 234-0090
500 New Jersey Ave., NW
Seventh Floor
Washington, DC  20001
pclement@bancroftpllc.com
Party name: Urethanes Plaintiffs
 
Robert A. Clifford Clifford Law Offices(312) 899-9090
120 N. LaSalle Street, 31st Floor
Chicago, IL  60602
rac@cliffordlaw.com
Party name: Complex Litigation Law Professors
 
Allan H. Erbsen University of Minnesota Law School612-626-6632
229 19th Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN  55455
aerbsen@umn.edu
Party name: Civil Procedure Scholars in support of neither party
 
Philip S. Goldberg Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP(202) 783-8400
1155 F Street NW
Washington, DC  20004
pgoldberg@shb.com
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
 
Andrew M. Grossman Baker & Hostetler LLP(202)-861-1697
Washington Sq., Suite 1100
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
agrossman@bakerlaw.com
Party name: Cato Institute
 
Deepak Gupta Gupta Wessler PLLC(202) 888-1741
1735 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20009
deepak@guptawessler.com
Party name: Impact Fund, et al.
 
William M. Jay Goodwin Procter LLP(202) 346-4000
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
wjay@goodwinprocter.com
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar
 
Martin S. Kaufman Atlantic Legal Foundation(914) 834-3322
2039 Palmer Avenue #104
Larchmont, NY  10538
mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation and The International Association of Defense Counsel
 
D. Christopher Lauderdale Jackson Lewis, PC(864)-232-7000
15 South Main St., Suite 700
Greenville, SC  29601
Lauderdc@jackonlewis.com
Party name: U.S. Poultry & Egg Association
 
Seth R. Lesser Klafter Olsen & Lesser LLP(914) 934-9200
Two International Drive, Suite 350
Rye Brook, NY  10573
seth@klafterolsen.com
Party name: AARP, et al.
 
Robert A. Long Jr. Covington & Burling LLP(202) 662-6000
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC  20001-4956
rlong@cov.com
Party name: Consumer Data Industry Association
 
Ellen Meriwether Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP(215) 864-2800
1101 Market Street, Suite 2650
Philadelphia, PA  19107
emeriwether@caffertyclobes.com
Party name: Economists and Other Social Scientists
 
Stephen J. Newman Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP(310) 556-5800
2029 Century Park East
Suite 1600
Los Angeles, CA  90067
lacalendar@stroock.com
Party name: Trans Union LLC
 
Sachin S. Pandya University of Connecticut School of Law860 570-5169
65 Elizabeth Street
Hartford, CT  06105
sachin.pandya@uconn.edu
Party name: Professors Alexandra D. Lahav & Sachin S. Pandya
 
Ashley C. Parrish King & Spalding LLP(202) 737-0500
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20006
aparrish@kslaw.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al.
 
Robert S. Peck Center for Constitutional Litigation, P.C.(202) 944-2803
777 6th Street, NW, Suite 250
Washington, DC  20001
robert.peck@cclfirm.com
Party name: Braun and Hummel
 
Elizabeth Barchas Prelogar Assistant to the Solicitor General(202) 514-2201
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530
Party name: United States
 
Lynn K. Rhinehart 815 16th Street, N.W. (202) 637-5310
Washington, DC  20006
jcoppess@aflcio.org
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
 
David N. Rosen David Rosen & Associates PC(203) 787-3513
400 Orange St.
New Haven, CT  06511
drosen@davidrosenlaw.com
Party name: Civil Procedure Professors
 
Richard A. Samp Washington Legal Foundation(202) 588-0302
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
rsamp@wlf.org
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
 
Jonathan D. Selbin Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein(212) 355-9500
250 Hudson Street, 8th Floor
New York, NY  10013-1413
jselbin@lchb.com
Party name: Public Justice, P.C.
 
Joseph M. Sellers Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC(202) 408-4600
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 500 - West Tower
Washington, DC  20005
jsellers@cohenmilstein.com
Party name: United Food and Commercial Workers International Union
 
Carolyn E. Shapiro Solicitor General(312) 814-5376
100 West Randolph Street
12th Floor
Chicago, IL  60601
cshapiro@atg.state.il.us
Party name: Illinois, et al.
 
Thomas V. Urmy Jr. Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP(617) 439-3939
2 Seaport Lane
Boston, MA  02210
turmy@shulaw.com
Party name: American Independent Business Alliance
 
Rae T. Vann NT Lakis, LLP(202) 629-5600
1501 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC  20005
rvann@ntlakis.com
Party name: Equal Employment Advisory Council
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: the United States
 
Jeffrey R. White Center for Constitutional Litigation PC(202) 944-2803
777 6th Street, N.W., Suite 250
Washington, DC  20001
jeffrey.white@cclfirm.com
Party name: American Association for Justice
 
James W. Wimberly Jr. Wimberly Lawson Steckel Schneider & Stine PC(404) 365-0900
3400 Peachtree Road NE
Suite 400 - Lenox Towers
Atlanta, GA  30326-1107
jww@wimlaw.com
Party name: The National Chicken Council
June 30, 2016 | Version 2014.1