Docket for 14-1111
No. 14-1111 | |
Title: |
Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Patricia A. Shiu, et al. |
|
Docketed: | March 13, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-5076) |
Decision Date: | December 12, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 12 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2015) |
Apr 8 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 13, 2015. |
May 12 2015 |
Brief of respondents Patricia A. Shiu, et al. in opposition filed. |
May 26 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 11, 2015. |
May 26 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 15 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|