Docket for 14-1048
No. 14-1048 | |
Title: |
National Organization for Marriage, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Deanna L. Geiger, et al. |
|
Docketed: | February 26, 2015 |
Linked with 14A857 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-35427) |
Decision Date: | August 27, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 24, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 11 2015 |
Application (14A857) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 22, 2015 to April 23, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Feb 20 2015 |
Application (14A857) denied by Justice Kennedy. |
Feb 23 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2015) |
Feb 27 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondents Deanna Geiger, et al. to respond filed. |
Mar 2 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondents John Kitzhaber, et al. to respond filed. |
Mar 3 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondents Paul Rummell, Benjamin West, Lisa Chickadonz, Christine Tanner, and Basic Rights Education Fund to respond filed. |
Mar 10 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent Randy Walruff to respond filed. |
Apr 1 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2015. |
Apr 20 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
John C. Eastman |
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence | (714) 628-2587 |
| c/o Chapman University School of Law | |
| One University Drive | |
| Orange, CA 92866 | |
| jeastman@chapman.edu |
Party name: National Organization for Marriage, Inc. |
Attorneys for Respondents: | | |
Lea Ann Easton |
Dorsay & Easton LLP | (503) 790-9060 |
Counsel of Record | 1 SW Columbia St. | |
| Suite 440 | |
| Portland, OR 97204 | |
Party name: Deanna Geiger, et al. |
| | |
Jennifer Scott Lloyd |
Oregon Department of Justice | (503)-378-4402 |
Counsel of Record | 1162 Court Street NE | |
| Salem, OR 97301-4096 | |
Party name: John Kitzhaber, et al. |
| | |
Steven R. Shapiro |
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation | (212) 549-2500 |
Counsel of Record | 125 Broad Street | |
| New York, NY 10004 | |
| sshapiro@aclu.org |
Party name: Paul Rummell, Benjamin West, Lisa Chickadonz, Christine Tanner, and Basic Rights Education Fund |
| | |
Jenny M. Madkour |
Multnomah County Attorney's Office | (503) 988-3138 |
| 501 SE Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 500 | |
| Portland, OR 97080 | |
| jenny.m.madkour@multco.us |
Party name: Randy Walruff |