Docket for 13-8570
No. 13-8570 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Harold Wayne Nichols, Petitioner |
v. |
Stanton Heidle, Warden |
|
Docketed: | February 5, 2014 |
Linked with 13A513 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (06-6495) |
Decision Date: | July 25, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 5, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 18 2013 |
Application (13A513) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 4, 2013 to February 2, 2014, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Nov 20 2013 |
Application (13A513) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 2, 2014. |
Feb 3 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 7, 2014) |
Oct 17 2014 |
Brief of respondent Stanton Heidle, Warden in opposition filed. |
Oct 29 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Harold Wayne Nichols filed. |
Nov 4 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 25, 2014. |
Dec 1 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|