Docket for 13-6398
No. 13-6398 | |
Title: |
Patrick A. Missud, Petitioner |
v. |
California, et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 17, 2013 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-15357) |
Decision Date: | August 19, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 10 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 17, 2013) |
Oct 7 2013 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Patrick A. Missud filed. |
Oct 26 2013 |
Second supplemental brief of petitioner Patrick A. Missud filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 31 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 15, 2013. |
Nov 18 2013 |
The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until December 9, 2013, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. |
Dec 5 2013 |
Petitioner complied with order of November 18, 2013. |
Dec 12 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 10, 2014. |
Jan 13 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|