Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 13-504
No. 13-504
Title:
John Edward Brewington, Petitioner
v.
North Carolina
Docketed:October 21, 2013
Linked with 13A268
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of North Carolina
  Case Nos.:(235PA10)
  Decision Date:June 27, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 11 2013 Application (13A268) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 25, 2013 to October 25, 2013, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Sep 16 2013 Application (13A268) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 25, 2013.
Oct 17 2013 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2013)
Nov 4 2013 Waiver of right of respondent North Carolina to respond filed.
Nov 20 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 6, 2013.
Dec 2 2013 Response Requested . (Due January 2, 2014)
Dec 16 2013 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 3, 2014.
Feb 3 2014 Brief of respondent North Carolina in opposition filed.
Feb 13 2014 Reply of petitioner John Edward Brewington filed.
Apr 29 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 15, 2014.
May 19 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 22, 2014.
May 27 2014 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jeffrey L. Fisher Stanford Law School, Supreme Court Litigation Clinic(650) 724-7081
    Counsel of Record559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA  94305-8610
jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
Party name: John Edward Brewington
Attorneys for Respondent:
Robert C. Montgomery Senior Deputy Attorney General(919) 716-6500
    Counsel of Record North Carolina Department of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC  27602
rmont@ncdoj.gov
Party name: North Carolina
October 23, 2014 | Version 2014.1