Docket for 13-1563
No. 13-1563 | |
Title: |
Jeffrey Alan Norkin, Petitioner |
v. |
The Florida Bar |
|
Docketed: | June 30, 2014 |
Linked with 13A1047 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Florida |
Case Nos.: | (11-1356) |
Decision Date: | October 31, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 23, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 17 2014 |
Application (13A1047) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 23, 2014 to June 22, 2014, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Apr 22 2014 |
Application (13A1047) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 22, 2014. |
Jun 23 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 30, 2014) |
Jul 7 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent The Florida Bar to respond filed. |
Jul 16 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|