Docket for 13-1530
No. 13-1530 | |
Vide 14-90 | |
Title: |
Novo Point LLC, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Peter Vogel, et al. |
|
Docketed: | June 24, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-11202) |
Decision Date: | December 18, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 4, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 14 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2014) |
Apr 14 2014 |
Appendix of Novo Point LLC, et al. filed. |
Jul 22 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 25, 2014, for all respondents. |
Aug 25 2014 |
Brief of respondent Jeffrey Baron in opposition filed. |
Oct 15 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2014. |
Nov 3 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|