Docket for 13-1491
No. 13-1491 | |
Vide 13-1493 | |
Title: |
Anthony Cuti, Petitioner |
v. |
United States |
|
Docketed: | June 16, 2014 |
Linked with 13A973 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-3756) |
Decision Date: | June 26, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 15, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 25 2014 |
Application (13A973) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 15, 2014 to June 13, 2014, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Mar 26 2014 |
Application (13A973) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until June 13, 2014. |
Jun 13 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 16, 2014) |
Jul 10 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 15, 2014. |
Jul 31 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 15, 2014. |
Sep 15 2014 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED. |
Sep 30 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Anthony Cuti filed. |
Oct 1 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014. |
Oct 20 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|