Docket for 13-10699
No. 13-10699 | |
Vide 13-10760 | |
Title: |
Rafael Carrae Edwards, aka Fel, Petitioner |
v. |
United States |
|
Docketed: | June 25, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-40515) |
Decision Date: | March 25, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 23 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 25, 2014) |
Jul 2 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Jul 10 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Aug 18 2014 |
Response Requested . (Due September 17, 2014) |
Sep 10 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 17, 2014. |
Oct 17 2014 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED. |
Nov 4 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 25, 2014. |
Dec 1 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|