~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 26 2014 |
Application (13A885) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 24, 2014 to May 23, 2014, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Mar 4 2014 |
Application (13A885) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 23, 2014. |
May 22 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 27, 2014) |
Jun 19 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 28, 2014. |
Jul 15 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 27, 2014. |
Aug 15 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 26, 2014. |
Sep 16 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 27, 2014. |
Oct 20 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 26, 2014. |
Nov 25 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 29, 2014. |
Dec 18 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 28, 2015. |
Jan 22 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 27, 2015. |
Feb 23 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 30, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED. |
Apr 14 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Ricardo Sanchez, Jr. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 16 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 1, 2015. |
May 4 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |