Docket for 12-930
No. 12-930
Title:
Lori Scialabba, Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rosalina Cuellar de Osorio, et al.
Docketed:January 25, 2013
Linked with 12A612
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(09-56786, 09-56846)
  Decision Date:September 26, 2012
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 13 2012 Application (12A612) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2012 to January 25, 2013, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Dec 18 2012 Application (12A612) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 25, 2013.
Jan 25 2013 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2013)
Feb 22 2013 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 3, 2013.
May 3 2013 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2013.
May 24 2013 Brief of respondents Rosalina Cuellar de Osorio, et al. in opposition filed.
Jun 4 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 20, 2013.
Jun 6 2013 Reply of petitioner Alejandro Mayorkas, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al. filed. (Distributed).
Jun 24 2013 Petition GRANTED.
Jul 26 2013 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 3, 2013.
Jul 26 2013 The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 28, 2013.
Aug 19 2013 Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Alejandro Mayorkas, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al.
Sep 3 2013 Brief of petitioners Alejandro Mayorkas, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al. filed.
Sep 17 2013 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday December 10, 2013.
Sep 17 2013 CIRCULATED
Sep 19 2013 Records received from USCA for the Ninth Circuit. (electronically filed available through PACER)
Sep 19 2013 Records received from USDC for the Central District of California electronically filed and located on PACER.
Oct 7 2013 Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Oct 28 2013 Brief of respondents Rosalina Cuellar de Osorio, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 4 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Catholic Legal Immigration Network Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 4 2013 Brief amici curiae of Immigration Advocacy Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Nov 4 2013 Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Nov 12 2013 Letter from counsel for amici curiae Immigration Advocacy Organizations received.
Nov 27 2013 Reply of petitioners Alejandro Mayorkas, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 10 2013 Argued. For petitioners: Elaine J. Goldenberg, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Mark C. Fleming, Boston, Mass.
Jun 9 2014 Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kagan, J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered an opinion, in which Kennedy and Ginsburg, JJ., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment, in which Scalia, J., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer, J., joined, and in which Thomas, J., joined except as to footnote 3.
Jul 3 2014 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Jul 17 2014 DISTRIBUTED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Lori Scialabba, Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al.
 
Elaine J. Goldenberg Assistant to the Solicitor General
Department of Justice
Washington, DC  20530
Party name: Lori Scialabba, Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Mark C. Fleming Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP(617) 526-6909
    Counsel of Record60 State Street
Boston, MA  02109
mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Rosalina Cuellar de Osorio, et al.
 
Nancy E. Miller Reeves and Associates APLC(626) 795-6777
2 North Lake Ave., Suite 950
Pasadena, CA  91101
nmiller@rreeves.com
Party name: Rosalina Cuellar de Osorio, et al.
Other:
Scott Payne Martin Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP(202)-887-3784
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20036
smartin@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Current and Former Members of Congress
 
Lori Alvino McGill Latham & Watkins LLP(202)-637-2319
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC  20004
lori.alvino.mcgill@lw.com
Party name: Immigration Advocacy Organizations
 
Brian J. Murray Jones Day(312) 782-3939
77 West Wacker Dr
Suite 3500
Chicago, IL  60601
bjmurray@jonesday.com
Party name: Catholic Legal Immigration Network Inc.